Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Frederick William Keating

Deceased

Archbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1859Born
20 Oct 188223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
1 Feb 190848.6AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
25 Feb 190848.6Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 192162.0AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
7 Feb 192868.6DiedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Frederick William Keating (VIAF: 285274348)
Archbishop Frederick William Keating (born , died ) Archbishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth Place18 Thorp Street, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Bernard, Seminary, Olton, Solihull, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, 5 Belvidere Road, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 15
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 274
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 132
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast