Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Gerard Thomas

Deceased

Bishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1930Born
5 Jun 195525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
27 Aug 198252.2AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 198252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
25 Dec 198858.5DiedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis Gerard Thomas
Bishop Francis Gerard Thomas (born , died ) Bishop of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStone, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Death PlaceBon Secours, Hospital, Beaconsfield, Buckinghamshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 193
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast