Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Laurence Craven

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1884Born
29 Jun 191228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
14 Jun 194763.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
14 Jun 194763.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
25 Jul 194763.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
15 Mar 196783.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Laurence Craven (VIAF: 304917044)
Bishop George Laurence Craven (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWednesbury, Staffordshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSt. James, Spanish Place, Church, Marylebone, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 76
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 75
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,854

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast