Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Joseph Emery

Deceased

Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1918Born
30 May 195335.0Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 196749.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 196749.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamallula
4 Mar 196849.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamallula
13 Sep 197658.3AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
5 Apr 198869.8DiedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Joseph Emery
Bishop Anthony Joseph Emery (born , died ) Bishop of Portsmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurton-on-Trent, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Edinburgh Road, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Milton, Cemetery, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1988, Page 483
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 88
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast