Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicholas Patrick Stephen (Nicolás Patricio Esteban) Cardinal Wiseman

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1802BornSeville, Spain
23 Jan 182522.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 182522.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 184037.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
22 May 184037.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
8 Jun 184037.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
3 Jul 184037.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central District, England, Great Britain
29 Aug 184745.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
18 Feb 184946.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 185048.1AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 185048.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Southwark, England, Great Britain
30 Sep 185048.1Elevated to Cardinal
3 Oct 185048.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
27 Jun 185148.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Southwark, England, Great Britain
15 Feb 186562.5DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Patrick Stephen (Nicolás Patricio Esteban) Wiseman
Nicholas Patrick Stephen (Nicolás Patricio Esteban) Cardinal Wiseman (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 525, and Page 597
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 150, Number 961
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 218, and Page 219
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 12 Apr 2016