Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Butler Roskell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1817Born
Sep 1839³22.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Midland District, England, Great Britain
9 Jun 184022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
29 Jul 185335.9AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 185336.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 1874³57.0ResignedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
2 Jul 187557.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
27 Jan 188365.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Butler Roskell
Bishop Richard Butler Roskell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGateacre, Liverpool, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint Barnabas, Cathedral, Notthingham, Notthinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Death PlaceWhitewell, Dunsop Bridge, Clitheroe, Lancashire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Hubert, Church, Dunsop Bridge, Clitheroe, Lancashire, Diocese of Leeds, England

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69, and Page 418
  • c34: CB, 10 Nov 2014
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 177
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,295
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 40
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast