Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Algernon Charles Stanley

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1843Born
1879²35.2Converted
18 Dec 188037.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 190359.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
12 Feb 190359.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
15 Mar 190359.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
23 Apr 192884.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Algernon Charles Stanley
Bishop Algernon Charles Stanley (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWinnington, Northwich, Cheshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Central District, England
Ordained PriestAcademy of Noble Ecclesiastics, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Gregory on the Coelian Hill, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death Placevia Giulia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 5
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 187
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast