Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kieran Thomas Conry

Bishop Emeritus of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1950 Born
19 Jul 197525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
8 May 200151.2AppointedBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
9 Jun 200151.3Ordained BishopBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
4 Oct 201464.6ResignedBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Kieran Thomas Conry (VIAF: 16369430)
Bishop Kieran Thomas Conry (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Arundel and Brighton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoventry, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestAll Souls, Church, Coventry, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady and St. Philip Howard, Cathedral, Arundel, West Sussex, Diocese of Arundel and Brighton, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arundel and Brighton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,991
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast