Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Francis Crispian Hollis

Bishop Emeritus of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1936 Born
11 Jul 196528.6Ordained PriestPriest of Clifton, England, Great Britain
13 Feb 198750.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
13 Feb 198750.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cincari
5 May 198750.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cincari
6 Dec 198852.0AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
11 Jul 201275.6RetiredBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roger Francis Crispian Hollis (VIAF: 9367902)
Bishop Roger Francis Crispian Hollis (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Portsmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBristol

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Portsmouth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2012
  • c1: CB, 17 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018