Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Romolo Compagnone, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1908BornArce
20 Sep 193022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
10 Mar 195344.8AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
12 Apr 195344.9Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
9 Mar 197263.8AppointedBishop of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
22 Dec 198375.6RetiredBishop of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
20 Apr 198980.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Romolo Compagnone:
Bishop Enrico Romolo Compagnone O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013