Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastiano Cardinal Baggio

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

Cardinal-Bishop of Velletri-Segni

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Vice-Dean (Sub-Dean) of the College of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1913BornRosà, Italy
21 Dec 193522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
30 Jun 195340.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
1 Jul 195340.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
26 Jul 195340.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
12 Mar 195945.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Canada
26 May 196451.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
28 Apr 196955.9Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 196956.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Angeli Custodi a Città Giardino
23 Jun 196956.1AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
26 Feb 197359.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
21 Dec 197360.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano alle Catacombe
12 Dec 197461.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Velletri
28 Aug 197865.3ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
28 Oct 197865.4ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
8 Apr 198470.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
25 Mar 198571.9AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
15 Apr 198672.9AppointedVice-Dean (Sub-Dean) of the College of Cardinals
31 Oct 199077.5RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
21 Mar 199379.8DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Baggio:
Sebastiano Cardinal Baggio (born , died ) President Emeritus of Vatican City State

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
  • a cardinal for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 May 2014