Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Ravetta

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1884Born
25 Jul 190924.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 193853.8AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
21 Dec 193853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
20 Jan 196580.0DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Umberto Ravetta
Bishop Umberto Ravetta (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast