Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gargitter

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1917BornLüsen
25 Oct 194225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
23 Apr 195235.2AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
18 May 195235.3Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
10 Feb 196144.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trento, Italy
12 Feb 196346.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Trento, Italy
29 Jul 198669.5ResignedBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
17 Jul 199174.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gargitter:
Bishop Joseph Gargitter (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013