Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fulton John Sheen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York

Titular Archbishop of Neoportus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1895BornEl Paso, IL
20 Sep 191924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Peoria, Illinois, USA
28 May 195156.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
28 May 195156.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesariana
11 Jun 195156.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesariana
21 Oct 196671.4AppointedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
6 Oct 196974.4RetiredBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
6 Oct 196974.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neoportus
9 Dec 197984.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Fulton John Sheen:
Archbishop Fulton John Sheen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rochester

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015