Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aristide Cardinal Cavallari

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1849BornChioggia
24 Sep 187223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
18 Aug 190354.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
18 Aug 190354.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
23 Aug 190354.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
13 Mar 190455.1AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
15 Apr 190758.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190758.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
24 Nov 191465.8DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aristide Cavallari:
Cardinal Aristide Cavallari (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
  • a cardinal for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013