Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Clemente Cardinal Maurer, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre, Bolivia

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1900Born
10 Sep 192121.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Sep 192525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Mar 195049.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
1 Mar 195049.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cea
16 Apr 195050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cea
27 Oct 195151.6AppointedArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
26 Jun 196767.2Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196767.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana
30 Nov 198383.7RetiredArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
27 Jun 199090.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sucre, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José Clemente Maurer
José Clemente Cardinal Maurer C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre

EventPlace
Birth PlacePüttlingen, Germany

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
  • a cardinal for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018