Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Sabatini, C.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1930 Born
19 Mar 195726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
15 Jul 197848.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
15 Jul 197848.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
21 Sep 197848.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
30 Sep 198252.3AppointedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
2 Sep 199969.2ResignedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Sabatini
Bishop Lawrence Sabatini C.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamloops

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained BishopVancouver, Archdiocese of Vancouver, British Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kamloops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast