Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Telesforo Giovanni Cioli, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1907BornBusche di Gualdo Tadino
15 Mar 193022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
5 Sep 195649.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Arezzo, Italy
5 Sep 195649.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Livias
21 Oct 195649.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Livias
23 Dec 196154.7SucceededBishop of Arezzo, Italy
7 Oct 197568.5AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
15 Feb 197870.8AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
11 Apr 198376.0RetiredBishop of Arezzo, Italy
11 Apr 198376.0RetiredBishop of Cortona, Italy
11 Apr 198376.0RetiredBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
15 Jan 200294.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Telesforo Giovanni Cioli:
Bishop Telesforo Giovanni Cioli O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro

  • a priest for 71.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 91
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013