Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pacifico Maria Luigi Perantoni, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1895Born
18 Dec 192025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1947²51.5AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
31 Jan 195256.6AppointedBishop of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
9 Mar 195256.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
21 Aug 196267.2AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy
14 Aug 197479.2RetiredArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy
3 Jan 198286.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Maria Luigi Perantoni (VIAF: 22226563)
Archbishop Pacifico Maria Luigi Perantoni O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lanciano e Ortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavalcaselle

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast