Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Egidio Cardinal Vagnozzi

Deceased

Prefect of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

Cardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe in via Trionfale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1906BornRoma, Italy
22 Dec 192822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
9 Mar 194943.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Philippines
14 Mar 194943.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
22 May 194943.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
9 Apr 195145.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
16 Dec 195852.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
26 Jun 196761.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giuseppe in via Trionfale
26 Jun 196761.3Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 196861.9AppointedPrefect of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
5 Mar 197367.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe in via Trionfale
26 Dec 198074.8DiedPrefect of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

MicroData Summary for Egidio Vagnozzi:
Egidio Cardinal Vagnozzi (born , died ) Prefect of Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
  • a cardinal for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014