Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino D’Arco

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1899Born
19 Mar 192324.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 195151.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
3 Feb 195151.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
1 Apr 195152.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
29 Mar 195253.0SucceededBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
21 Sep 196667.5DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino D’Arco
Bishop Agostino D’Arco (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIschia

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast