Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aurelio Signora

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

Titular Bishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1902BornBudoia
19 Jul 192522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
12 Mar 195754.4AppointedPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
12 Mar 195754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicosia
25 Apr 195754.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicosia
31 Dec 197775.2RetiredPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
30 Apr 199087.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Signora:
Archbishop Aurelio Signora (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013