Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Picchinenna

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1912BornMelfi
21 Jul 193522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
2 Jul 195441.5AppointedBishop of Acerenza, Italy
7 Oct 195441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acerenza, Italy
4 Sep 196148.7AppointedBishop of Cosenza, Italy
29 May 197158.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Catania, Italy
29 May 197158.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beroea
16 Jul 197461.6SucceededArchbishop of Catania, Italy
1 Jun 198875.4RetiredArchbishop of Catania, Italy
24 Oct 200491.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Picchinenna:
Archbishop Domenico Picchinenna (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Catania

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 50.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013