Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Carta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1907BornSerdiana
28 Jul 193528.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 195547.6AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
22 May 195547.8Ordained BishopBishop of Foggia, Italy
22 Mar 196254.6AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
18 Mar 198274.6RetiredArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
9 Mar 199688.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Carta:
Archbishop Paolo Carta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sassari

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014