Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Pirelli

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1895BornVarenna
14 Jun 191823.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 195257.2AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
27 Apr 195257.3Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
8 Jan 195762.0ResignedBishop of Andria, Italy
8 Jan 195762.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysias
14 Aug 196368.6AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
14 Aug 196469.6DiedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pirelli:
Bishop Luigi Pirelli (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013