Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Botto

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1896BornValparaiso
10 Jul 192124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chiavari, Italy
1 Aug 194952.9AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
2 Oct 194953.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
2 May 196972.6ResignedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
2 May 196972.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Risinium
3 Dec 197074.2ResignedTitular Archbishop of Risinium
19 Mar 197477.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Botto:
Archbishop Paolo Botto (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013