Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siro Silvestri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1913BornAmeglia
31 Dec 193724.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 195541.8AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
18 Sep 195541.9Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
3 Sep 197561.9AppointedBishop of La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
7 Dec 198976.1RetiredBishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy
14 Jun 199783.7DiedBishop Emeritus of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Siro Silvestri:
Bishop Siro Silvestri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013