Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Humberto Cardinal Quintero Parra

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1902BornMucuchies
22 Aug 192623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mérida, Venezuela
7 Sep 195351.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mérida, Venezuela
7 Sep 195351.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
6 Dec 195351.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
31 Aug 196057.9AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
16 Jan 196158.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 196158.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
24 May 198077.7RetiredArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
8 Jul 198481.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Humberto Quintero Parra:
Cardinal José Humberto Quintero Parra (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 16 Dec 2013