Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pullano

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1907Born
3 Aug 193023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Catanzaro, Italy
22 Apr 195345.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Patti, Italy
22 Apr 195345.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
29 Jun 195345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
2 Aug 195750.0SucceededBishop of Patti, Italy
30 Nov 197770.3DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pullano (VIAF: 89371663)
Bishop Giuseppe Pullano (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Elia di Pentone

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast