Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Urbani

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1900BornVenice
24 Sep 192222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
26 Oct 194646.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Axomis
8 Dec 194646.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axomis
27 Nov 194848.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
14 Apr 195555.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Verona, Italy
11 Nov 195858.6AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
15 Dec 195858.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195858.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
19 Mar 196262.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
17 Sep 196969.5DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Urbani:
Cardinal Giovanni Urbani (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1958
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013