Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Artemio Prati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carpi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1907Born
15 Mar 193023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
31 Dec 195245.8AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
24 Feb 195346.0Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
7 Apr 198376.1RetiredBishop of Carpi, Italy
4 Mar 200497.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Artemio Prati
Bishop Artemio Prati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carpi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontenure, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained PriestPiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopSan Vitale, Church, Salsomaggiore Terme, Diocese of Piacenza
Death PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Carpi, Diocese of Carpi

  • a priest for 73.9 years
  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • opd/loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast