Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Venezia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avellino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1911BornAvellino
21 Dec 193524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Avellino, Italy
11 Feb 195139.6AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
15 Apr 195139.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
1958²46.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Benevento, Italy
1960²48.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Benevento, Italy
2 Jun 196755.9AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
28 Feb 198775.7RetiredBishop of Avellino, Italy
27 Apr 199179.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Avellino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Venezia:
Bishop Pasquale Venezia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avellino

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 31
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015