Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Trento

Archidioecesis Tridentina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Lauro Tisi, Archbishop
  • Luigi Bressan, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 June 1929
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 6,212 (2,399 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Triveneto
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesitn.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arcivescovile, Piazza Fiera 2, 38122 Trento, Italia
  • Telephone: 0461.89.11.11
  • Fax: 0461.89.12.01

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Trento
2nd CenturyErectedDiocese of Trento (erected)
29 January 1938Territory LostDiocese of Trento (Vent) Apostolic Administration of Innsbruck
Archdiocese of Trento
14 June 1929ElevatedDiocese of Trento Archdiocese of Trento
6 July 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Trento (Bauzan and Magasa and Turano) Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
6 July 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Trento (Val d'Astico and Pedemonte) Diocese of Vicenza
6 August 1964ElevatedArchdiocese of Trento (became a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Trento
1950613,500615,00099.8%1,1495681,7173578342,168426ap1951
1970425,471425,78299.9%7943991,1933564941,922448ap1971
1980442,452442,87399.9%6963601,0564184951,693458ap1981
1990440,000445,16598.8%62931194046884271,061456ap1991
1999461,000464,39899.3%55228984154817400864456ap2000
2000469,000473,00099.2%54127781857319377854456ap2001
2001468,800470,94699.5%52228280458319374759456ap2002
2002469,600472,81699.3%49527577060920364744456ap2003
2003469,840473,15199.3%48426975362318355756454ap2004
2004470,513477,01798.6%47428375762119344691454ap2005
2010481,232505,52795.2%40226566772128319553452ap2011
2014486,000530,30891.6%35623158782728268458452ap2015
2017487,800538,22390.6%33220753990527233370452ap2018
2020488,000541,09890.2%30319349698324224350452ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Trento
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 497, and Page 498
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 256
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 318
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 344
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 389, and Page 390
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 416, and Page 417
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 377
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 566
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 376
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 316, to Page 317
  • Archdiocese of Trento
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 57, Page 367, and Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 9 Feb 2024