Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Neideck

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1505SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
5 Jun 1506ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
1 Jul 1507Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
5 Jun 1514DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Georg von Neideck:
Bishop Georg von Neideck (died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a bishop for 6.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 318
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,908

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014