Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuel Maria Thun

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1763BornTrento
24 Jul 179734.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
24 Jul 179734.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Iasus
3 Sep 179734.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iasus
2 Apr 180037.0SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
11 Aug 180037.3ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
9 Oct 181855.5DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuel Maria Thun (VIAF: 80584404)
Bishop Emanuel Maria Thun (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 241, and Page 451
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 377
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Jul 2016