Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Antonio Passi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trento

Titular Bishop of Pella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1693³BornPressano
21 Dec 171522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
25 Feb 171622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
28 Sep 174451.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
28 Sep 174451.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
25 Oct 174451.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
23 Jul 177481.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Antonio Passi:
Bishop Bartolomeo Antonio Passi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 332, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015