Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Libardoni, O.S.I. †

Deceased

Prelate of Huarí

Titular Bishop of Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1907BornLevico, Italy
29 Jun 194033.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Saint Joseph
15 May 195850.9AppointedPrelate of Huarí, Peru
30 Sep 196457.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Africa
1 Nov 196457.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Africa
25 Oct 196659.3DiedPrelate of Huarí, Peru

MicroData Summary for Marco Libardoni:
Bishop Marco Libardoni O.S.I. (born , died ) Prelate of Huarí

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1960
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013