Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Zendron

Bishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1954 Born
26 Jun 197824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
12 Mar 200854.0AppointedBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
17 May 200854.1Ordained BishopBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
25 May 200854.2InstalledBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Guido Zendron
Bishop Guido Zendron (born ) Bishop of Paulo Afonso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisignago, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paulo Afonso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,746

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast