Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johannes Baptiste Cardinal Franzelin, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1816Born
184932.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Apr 187659.9Elevated to Cardinal
7 Apr 187659.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
11 Dec 188670.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptiste Franzelin
Johannes Baptiste Cardinal Franzelin S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldino, Austria

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast