Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Gorizia

Archidioecesis Goritiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archdiocese of Gorizia (Görz)
6 July 1751ErectedPatriarchate of Aquileia (suppressed) Archdiocese of Gorizia (Görz) (erected)
Archdiocese of Udine (erected)
Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
12 September 1791UnitedArchdiocese of Gorizia (Görz)
Diocese of Gradisca (d’Isonzo)
Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
17 March 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca (S. Croce and the parish of S. Rochi in Aurisina) Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper)
27 November 1971Territory AddedArchdiocese of Ljubljana (Vrsnik, Korita and parts of Zirovnica, Mrzli vrh, Javorjev Dol, Koprivnik, Dole, and llbvte) Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
27 November 1971Territory LostArchdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca (Parts of Medvedje) Archdiocese of Ljubljana
17 October 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca ((areas in Slovenia))
Diocese of Rijeka (-Opatija) ((areas in Slovenia))
Diocese of Trieste e Capodistria (Trst i Koper) ((areas in Slovenia))
Diocese of Koper
Archdiocese of Gorizia
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca Archdiocese of Gorizia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
1950169,440169,53099.9%184452297399657486ap1951
1970174,000175,00099.4%1736423773487663102ap1971
1980184,560189,80097.2%15843201918168599107ap1981
Archdiocese of Gorizia
1990182,000183,70099.1%138341721,0585249391ap1991
1999180,600181,90099.3%121371581,14384837990ap2000
2000179,300180,40099.4%123381611,11384839890ap2001
2001180,000182,50098.6%120371571,14684738390ap2002
2002180,000181,60099.1%114371511,19294738890ap2003
2003180,000181,70099.1%111301411,276103837290ap2004
2004180,000182,60098.6%109321411,2764133090ap2005
2006179,500182,20098.5%112291411,273123531790ap2007
2013177,700185,66795.7%97161131,572132324890ap2014
2016171,859183,82793.5%93171101,562132422090ap2017
2019169,000180,80093.5%8414981,724121818090ap2020
2021175,300183,38495.6%8414981,788121818090ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Gorizia (Görz)
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 278
  • Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 64, Page 71, and Page 72
  • Archdiocese of Gorizia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 444, and Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 9 Feb 2024