Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Manzana

Bishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1947 BornMori, Italy
26 Jun 197325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
15 Jun 200456.7AppointedBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
5 Sep 200456.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
17 Oct 200457.0InstalledBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mariano Manzana:
Bishop Mariano Manzana (born ) Bishop of Mossoró

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mossoró.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,680

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013