Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Emmanuelle Sardagna de Hohenstein

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cremona

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1772BornTrento
7 Dec 179422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
12 Mar 183058.0SelectedBishop of Cremona, Italy
28 Feb 183158.9ConfirmedBishop of Cremona, Italy
10 Apr 183159.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
183764.8ResignedBishop of Cremona, Italy
21 Feb 183966.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
12 Jan 184067.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Emmanuelle Sardagna de Hohenstein:
Archbishop Carlo Emmanuelle Sardagna de Hohenstein (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cremona

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 124, and Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013