Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Maria Gottardi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1912Born
1 Jul 193422.1Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
12 Feb 196350.7AppointedArchbishop of Trento, Italy
24 Mar 196350.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trento, Italy
7 Dec 198775.6RetiredArchbishop of Trento, Italy
24 Mar 200188.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Maria Gottardi
Archbishop Alessandro Maria Gottardi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018