Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leopold Ernst Cardinal von Firmian

Deceased

Bishop of Passau

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1708BornTrent
25 Sep 172921.0Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
13 Feb 173930.3AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
1 Mar 173930.4Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
29 May 174839.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
16 Dec 174840.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
20 Jan 175647.3ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
1 Sep 176354.9SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
26 Sep 176355.0ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
14 Dec 177264.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 178273.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
13 Mar 178374.4DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leopold Ernst von Firmian:
Leopold Ernst Cardinal von Firmian (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1772
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1739, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 329, and Page 371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015