Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Hinderbach

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1418Born
12 May 146648.3AppointedBishop of Trento, Italy
20 Jul 146648.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
21 Sep 148668.7DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Hinderbach (VIAF: 14826987)
Bishop Johann Hinderbach (born 1418, died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssia
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 256
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,479
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1466, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast