Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Filippi, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Kotido, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1945 Born
28 Apr 197732.1Perpetual VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
26 Jun 197833.2Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
17 Aug 200964.4AppointedBishop of Kotido, Uganda
19 Dec 200964.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kotido, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Filippi
Bishop Giuseppe Filippi M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Kotido

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaselga del Bondone, Archdiocese of Trento, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Archdiocese of Trento, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kotido, Diocese of Kotido

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kotido.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,331
  • c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast