Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sisto Mazzoldi, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moroto, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1898Born
29 Jun 192224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
8 Jul 195052.4AppointedPrefect of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan
12 Apr 195153.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel, Sudan
12 Apr 195153.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamus
24 Jun 195153.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamus
22 Mar 196567.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Moroto, Uganda
12 Jun 196769.4AppointedBishop of Moroto, Uganda
29 Nov 198082.8RetiredBishop of Moroto, Uganda
27 Jul 198789.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Moroto, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Sisto Mazzoldi
Bishop Sisto Mazzoldi F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moroto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNago, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento, Italy

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast