Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Placido Maria Nicolini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1877Born
25 Mar 189316.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Jul 189922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Aug 191942.6AppointedAbbot of Santissima TrinitÓ di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
22 Jun 192851.4AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
2 Sep 192851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
25 Nov 197396.8DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Placido Maria Nicolini (VIAF: 39123225)
Bishop Giuseppe Placido Maria Nicolini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillazzano
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ di Cava de’ Tirreni, Abbey, Cava, Territorial Abbey of Santissima TrinitÓ di Cava de’ Tirreni

  • a priest for 74.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 57
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast