Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich von Liechtenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Aug 1493SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
11 Apr 1496ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
16 Sep 1505DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ulrich von Liechtenstein
Bishop Ulrich von Liechtenstein (died ) Bishop of Trento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 256
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,496, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast