Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Vittorio Alberti d’Enno

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1623BornPerigne
20 Oct 166946.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
28 Apr 168965.7SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
10 Dec 169168.3ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
3 May 169369.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
31 Dec 169572.4DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Vittorio Alberti d’Enno:
Bishop Giuseppe Vittorio Alberti d’Enno (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015